THE HIBBERT TRUST

Charity Number: 233121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of Liberal Religion, Interfaith understanding and Unitarian Christianity through public interest and personal scholarship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £77,679
Total expenditure: £44,919

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEREK MCAULEY Chair 31 January 2012
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST)
Received: 51 days late
ARTHUR MCDOUGALL FUND
Received: On time
UNITARIAN HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
James Frederick Lister Croft Trustee 26 June 2024
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
James Chiriyankandath Trustee 22 March 2023
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
Catrin Louise Davies Ms Trustee 22 November 2019
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Melanie Jane Prideaux Trustee 17 June 2013
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
Helen Mason Trustee
THE GREEN, FLAGG
Received: 68 days late
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
LUTHER KING HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
MARK DOUGLAS PEARCE Trustee
THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES
Received: On time
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £175.26k £175.26k £75.75k £73.74k £77.68k
Total expenditure £561.85k £561.85k £58.42k £64.15k £44.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 March 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 March 2024 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 28 JULY 1883
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION (BY MEANS OF COURSES OF LECTURES OR ANY OTHER MEANS WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPEAR TO THE SAID HIBBERT TRUSTEES AS TRUSTEES OF THE CASE FUND LIKELY TO BE MORE EFFECTIVE) OF FREE THOUGHT AND THE SEARCH AFTER TRUTH OF UNFETTERED LEARNING AND FRANK UTTERANCE ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH RELIGION OR WITH THE NATURE AND DEVELOPMENT AND HIGHEST CULTURE OF MAN AND SUBJECT ALWAYS TO THE EXPRESS DECLARATION THAT ANY APPLICATION OF SUCH INCOME FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY PARTICULAR FORM OF ANY THEOLOGICAL OPINION OR SUBJECT TO ANY PRECONVEIVED LIMITATIONS OF DOCTRINE OR DOCTRINAL EXPOSITION OTHERWISE THAN AS THE SUBJECT FOR THE TIME BEING UNDER CONSIDERATION SHALL BE IPSO FACTO UNLAWFUL AND PROHIBITED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 17 December 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Hibbert Trust UNITARIAN HQ
ESSEX HALL
1-6 ESSEX STREET
LONDON
WC2R 3HY
Phone:
07970063736