LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sixteen almshouses for elderly, needy people with a strong connection to Worcester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 17 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J V PANTER | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Anne Teresa King | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Nicola Jane Rogers | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Laura Catherine Nancy Baxter | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Lorraine Angela Preece | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Kay Vincent | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Douglas Brian Dale | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|||||||||
COLIN ANSTEY | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Peter William Alan Hughes | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS G T NEWMAN | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MR T J BRIDGES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.09k | £127.10k | £131.24k | £135.64k | £141.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.50k | £100.00k | £123.59k | £134.07k | £159.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1868 (U.V.62 P.60) SCHEME DATED 27 MARCH 1962 AND SCHEME DATED 8 APRIL 1976.
Charitable objects
1)PROVISION OF A CHAPEL FOR THE ALMS-PEOPLE 2)PROVISION & MAINTENANCE OF A)ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR OLD MEN AND WOMEN; B)A SCHOOL HOUSE; C) AN ASYLUM; D)WASHOUSES OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE URPOSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES 3)PAYMENT TO THE CHAPLAIN WHO SHALL BE A MEMBER OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND IN HOLY ORDERS AND SHALL PERFORM DIVINE SERVICE ON SUNDAY AND HOLY DAYS AND READ PRAYERS EVERY MORNING AND EVENING 4EPAYMENT TO THE ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WORCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
KATERYN HEYWOOD HOUSE
BERKELEY COURT
THE FOREGATE
WORCESTER
WR1 3QG
- Phone:
- 01905317117
- Email:
- admin@lasletts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window