FAIRSTEAD TRUST

Charity number: 235404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

relief for the poor

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £967
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FAIRSTEAD CHARITY (Working name)
  • BACK HILLS ALLOTMENTS (Previous name)
  • THE FAIRSTEAD TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Helen Louise Grover Trustee 21 November 2024
TOWN ESTATE (CHURCH) CHARITY
Received: On time
REVEREND CHARLES MARTYN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew Edwards Trustee 15 March 2024
None on record
LOTTIE CLEMENTS Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
TIM HOLT-WILSON Trustee 14 January 2013
None on record
PETER BECK Trustee 14 January 2013
None on record
Dr SIMON GOWEN Trustee 14 January 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £780 £792 £835 £921 £967
Total expenditure £0 £1.30k £350 £800 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ASH TREE HOUSE
FEN LANE
RICKINGHALL
DISS
IP22 1DR
Phone:
01379898454