CHARITY OF JOSHUA BROOKING ROWE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Originally set up to provide help to poor people living in or attending the Parish Church of Plympton St. Maurice. "Poor" has been interpreted by the Trustees as those people needing help who are unable to provide it themselves. Also the Trustees will consider helping oganisations who provide facilities for the needy in the Parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 13 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Douglas Harris | Chair | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Ward | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA LOUISE GIBBONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR VAL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £511 | £190 | £9 | £703 | £3.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1908 U V 192 P 349
Charitable objects
TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONG SUCH DESERVING POOR PERSONS AS THE RECTOR AND CHURCHWARDENS SHALL SELECT, WHO ARE REGULARLY ATTENDANTS AT THE PARISH CHURCH, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE WHO ARE COMMUNICANTS.
Area of benefit
PLYMPTON ST MAURICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 LONGBROOK STREET
PLYMOUTH
PL7 1NJ
- Phone:
- 01752346630
- Email:
- vgibbons@cerner.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window