Financial history SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN TRUST (INCORPORATED)

Charity Number: 235831
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £66.13k £57.31k £59.32k £83.89k £74.40k
Total expenditure £245.50k £65.90k £52.29k £86.45k £84.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A