Financial history THE FARMINGTON TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 237934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £697.01k £517.74k £998.88k £648.67k £910.42k
Total expenditure £659.03k £806.92k £875.88k £678.43k £892.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £152.16k £1.50k £451.50k £2.25k £308.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £488.25k £460.56k £492.84k £602.61k £602.42k
Income - Other £56.61k £55.69k £54.54k £43.81k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £547.69k £679.15k £747.40k £546.44k £767.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds £111.34k £127.76k £128.48k £131.98k £124.89k
Expenditure - Governance £5.22k £5.25k £5.62k £6.05k £21.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £359.52k £601.79k £669.69k £480.84k £746.30k
Expenditure - Investment management £111.34k £64.69k £65.54k £131.98k £124.89k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0