STANFORD-IN-THE-VALE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES

Charity number: 239204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Annual payments to the Elderly Poor of the Village and individual bursaries to persons in need of small financial assistance living within the community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,536
Total expenditure: £1,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Warren Trustee 10 February 2025
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
Suzanne Penman Trustee 01 May 2024
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
Karin Cuss-Williams Trustee 01 April 2011
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
Rosemary Packer Trustee 01 April 2000
None on record
Lord Ragland GEOFFREY SOMERSET Trustee
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
MARK LAWRENCE ISAACS Trustee
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.25k £959 £1.54k £768 £1.54k
Total expenditure £497 £22 £0 £1.20k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 13 JULY 1984
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WITH PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO WOMEN UPON THEIR MARRIAGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STANFORD-IN-THE-VALE
Registration history
  • 11 January 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
DRAGON HOUSE
CHURCH GREEN
STANFORD IN THE VALE
FARINGDON
SN7 8HU
Phone:
01367710626
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available