Financial history THE GUILD OF ALL SOULS

Charity number: 240234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £39.77k £44.24k £54.14k £42.15k £40.53k
Total expenditure £50.71k £45.42k £51.80k £55.31k £44.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A