Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF CHRISTCHURCH CHARITIES FUND

Charity number: 241146
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £78.24k £16.94k £37.51k £20.70k £29.76k
Total expenditure £132.72k £107.73k £52.88k £29.28k £44.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A