THAME CHARITIES

Charity number: 241914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Activities for the benefit of the people of Thame.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 February 2024

Total income: £23,352
Total expenditure: £22,657

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THAME WELFARE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSALIE ANNE GIBSON Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN THAME
Received: On time
Gerallt Glasnant Phillips Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Duncan James Keeley Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Rev Michael Dudley Reading Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
JENNIFER LOUISA MACKIE Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
Timothy Morton Trustee 28 January 2019
None on record
Gordon Taylor Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
NIGEL CHAMPKEN-WOODS Trustee 14 September 2011
MAYOR OF THAME'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
Thame Senior Friendship Centre
Received: On time
ANN MIDWINTER Trustee
Thame Senior Friendship Centre
Received: On time
THE THAME AND OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
HELENA FICKLING Trustee
None on record
DAVID DODDS Trustee
None on record
Dr TIMOTHY MITCHELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/02/2020 09/02/2021 09/02/2022 09/02/2023 09/02/2024
Total gross income £20.43k £16.84k £15.73k £19.24k £23.35k
Total expenditure £37.23k £14.04k £12.22k £31.88k £22.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 February 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2020 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF THAME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THAME
Registration history
  • 28 May 1991 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
12A Croft Road
THAME
Oxfordshire
OX9 3JF
Phone:
01844212564
Website:

No information available