ROYAL NAVY (ROMAN CATHOLIC) TRUST

Charity number: 242543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust facilitates the faith practice of Roman Catholic members of the Navy, their families and those other Service personnel who wish to associate. It enables Chaplains to provide the best pastoral care and resources, and to engage people more deeply with the moral component of their military responsibilities. It supports the pastoral ministry of the Bishop of the Forces to those same people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £61,795
Total expenditure: £69,829

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ROYAL NAVY R C TRUST (Working name)
  • ROYAL NAVY ROMAN CATHOLIC TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER PAUL THORPE Chair 16 July 2020
THORPE CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL AIR FORCE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOPRIC OF THE FORCES (GB)
Received: On time
THE ARMY ROMAN CATHOLIC TRUST
Received: On time
THE VICARIATE HEADQUARTERS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Robert Constantin Matau Trustee 01 September 2024
THE VICARIATE HEADQUARTERS TRUST
Received: On time
Lieutenant Commander Paul Vincent A'Hern Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
Rt Rev Paul James Mason Trustee 12 September 2018
SAFE SPACES ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
ROYAL AIR FORCE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
THE VICARIATE HEADQUARTERS TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARMY ROMAN CATHOLIC TRUST
Received: On time
Stella Maris
Received: On time
COMMODORE NICK TINDAL Trustee 12 July 2018
THE ALDGATE AND ALLHALLOWS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SURPLUS FUND OF THE ROYAL NAVY CLUB
Received: On time
THE F E CLEARY SCHOOLS FUND
Received: On time
PETER DONALD FIRTH Trustee 29 January 2015
THE VICARIATE HEADQUARTERS TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL AIR FORCE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.58k £53.41k £54.53k £58.69k £61.80k
Total expenditure £51.73k £34.60k £40.93k £104.90k £69.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHAW GIBBS LIMITED
WEY COURT WEST
UNION ROAD
FARNHAM
GU9 7PT
Phone:
01252711244
Website:

No information available