MOTHERS UNION (DIOCESE OF DERBY BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holidays & outings for families under stress. Provide clothing for prem babies in Derbyshire hospitals & toiletries for emergency admissions. Provide Helpful Books for children in Primary Schools. Support for women's refuges & help with project for young girls caught up in prostitution. We help run parenting groups and Mother & Toddler groups. Provide Moses Baskets for Derby Refugee Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
329 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 August 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily May Brailsford | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia May Walton Mrs | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eleanor Shields Berry | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
DENISE TOMLINSON | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Ball | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Joy Johnston | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Orchard | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Porter | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Fitch | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Randall | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Elizabeth McMullen | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
BERYL MURDY | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Janet Bradshaw Mrs | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.76k | £89.27k | £80.70k | £73.89k | £33.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.93k | £43.54k | £38.29k | £31.65k | £32.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO UPHOLD CHRIST'S TEACHING ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE IT'S WIDER UNDERSTANDING. 2) TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDREN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH. 3) TO MAINTAIN A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIANS, UNITED IN PRAYER, WORSHIP AND SERVICE. 4) TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND FOR THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN. 5) TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mothers' Union Office
Church House
Full Street
Derby
DE1 3DR
- Phone:
- 07731 342447
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window