THE BUSBY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Buckinghamshire
- Lincolnshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Peter Bottomley peter bottomley sir | Chair |
|
||||||
SARAH GORDON | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROLY KEATING | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|||||
RT REV JOHN OLIVER | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sir Guy Weston HonRCM | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN PORTEOUS OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RIGHT REVEREND DAVID STANCLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZANNA TAVERNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL BAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.18k | £6.54k | £6.48k | £8.67k | £8.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.50k | £921 | £879 | £852 | £852 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH DECEMBER 1887, DETERMINATION ORDER OF 27TH SEPTEMBER 1907 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF THE 23RD OCTOBER 1914, 20TH SEPTEMBER 1957 AND 8TH MAY 1974
Charitable objects
(1) $10 TO BE APPLIED IN PROVIDING A DINNER OR DINNERS FOR THE TRUSTEES (2) $30 TO A LECTURER, BEING A MEMBER OF CHRIST CHURCH IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (3) $40 TO THE VICAR OF THE PARISH OF WILLEN, DURING ANY PERIOD WHEN THERE IS NO VICAR AS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY THE SAME TO THE PERSON FOR THE TIME BEING HAVING THE RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE CURE OF SOULS OF THAT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH (4) GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF SUCH POOR MINISTERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK DESERVING WHO SHALL BE BENEFICED OR LICENSED IN ONE OF THE COUNTINES OF LINCOLN, OXFORD, MIDDLESEX OR BUCKINGHAM (5) SUBJECT TO THESE PAYMENTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF POOR CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO HAVE BEEN BENEFICED OR LICENSED IN ONE OF THE SAID FOUR COUNTIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHAPTER OFFICE
20 DEANS YARD
LONDON
SW1P 3PA
- Phone:
- 020 7222 5152
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window