GUNNER MAGAZINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to promote military efficiency by maintaining and increasing the esprit de corps and well being of the Royal Regiment of Artillery through the publication of matters of interest to all its members and former members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 September 1965: Standard registration
- 09 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 09 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1122002 ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
- GUNNER (Working name)
- THE GUNNER (Working name)
- THE GUNNER MAGAZINE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.38k | £113.58k | £108.41k | £96.49k | £145.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.73k | £124.59k | £119.67k | £94.23k | £149.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 25 August 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 30 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 22 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 10 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 04 August 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 20 JUNE 2013
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY MAINTAINING AND INCREASING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS AND WELL-BEING OF THE ROYAL REGIMENT OF ARTILLERY THROUGH THE PUBLICATION OF MATTERS OF INTEREST TO ALL ITS MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS. 2) IN ADMINISTERING THIS CHARITY, THE TRUSTEES MUST HAVE REGARD TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE GUNNER MAGAZINE, ORIGINALLY SET OUT IN 1919, WHICH ARE CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window