ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 246269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Royal Anthropological Institute of Great Britain and Ireland (RAI) is the world's longest-established scholarly association dedicated to the furtherance of anthropology (the study of humankind) in its broadest and most inclusive sense.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • R A I (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Deborah Anne Swallow Chair 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Prof Paul Basu Trustee 24 October 2024
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
THE SUSSEX ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Prof Haidy Lynne Geismar Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Professor Hazel Andrews Trustee 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
RADCLIFFE-BROWN MEMORIAL TRUST FUND FOR SOCIAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL RESEARCH
Received: On time
Professor Rachael Gooberman-Hill Trustee 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Garry Marvin Trustee 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Celia Plender Trustee 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Jamie Tehrani Trustee 18 October 2022
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Maya Unnithan Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Dr RICHARD VOKES Trustee 27 September 2021
ALL OUR CHILDREN
Received: On time
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Nichola Khan Trustee 27 September 2021
BLOOMSBURY PAKISTAN SOCIAL SCIENCE RESEARCH & ADVOCACY
Received: On time
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
RADCLIFFE-BROWN MEMORIAL TRUST FUND FOR SOCIAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL RESEARCH
Received: On time
Professor Ann Rosalind David Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Richard Fardon Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Emma Gilberthorpe Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Keith Thorpe Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Paul Lane Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr SIMON UNDERDOWN Trustee 27 September 2021
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor Ann MacLarnon Trustee 16 October 2020
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Helene NEVEU KRINGELBACH Trustee 16 October 2020
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Shireen Walton Trustee 16 October 2020
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Professor John Anthony Jamys Gowlett Trustee 08 October 2018
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
Dr Fiona Bowie Trustee 30 September 2016
ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.12m £1.12m £1.17m £0 £0
Total expenditure £990.58k £903.33k £919.24k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £105.90k £30.29k £69.56k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £940.36k £942.80k £947.80k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £29.84k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £95.59k £143.30k £142.85k N/A N/A
Income - Other £10.26k £6.01k £6.09k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £20.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £990.58k £903.33k £919.24k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.01k £17.45k £14.77k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 27 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 27 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1949
Charitable objects
A PRIZE TO BE AWARDED TO THE UNDERGRADUATE STUDENT OR OTHER PERSON WHO HAS SHOWN OUTSTANDING APTITUDE IN THE PROSECUTION OF ANTHROPOLOGICAL RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 October 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Royal Anthropological Institute
50 Fitzroy Street
London
W1T 5BT
Phone:
442073870455