GUILDFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our principal activity is to promote and assist the Church of England in spreading the gospel of Jesus Christ primarily in the Diocese of Guildford. We oversee the funding of the ministry within the Diocese, including the provision of housing and pensions; financing of a variety of support service activities; and the support of parishes and other related bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£14,524,000
Donations and legacies | £12.48m | |
Charitable activities | £676.00k | |
Other trading activities | £621.00k | |
Investments | £749.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,528,000
Raising funds | £639.00k | |
Charitable activities | £14.89m | |
Other | £0 |
-£3,434,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £106,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £639.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.89m |
People

59 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 September 1967: Standard registration
- DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Peter Roberts | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Hannah Terese Moore | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Monilola Babatunde | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Robert Gerard Cooper | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Elizabeth Angela Klintworth | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Alwyn Antonio Basilio Pereira | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Howard Gordon Mason | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Kirsten Louise Rosslyn-Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Harold David Uffindell | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Catharine Mary Mabuza | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Anna Margaret Shaw | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Gordon Adrian McFarland | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Graeme Roderick Holmes Hampshire | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Dixon Bessant | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Benjamin Harold Beecroft | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Martin Christopher Breadmore | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Graham Everness | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
THE VEN PAUL DAVIES | Trustee | 10 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
The Right Reverend Andrew John Watson | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
CANON PETER NIGEL EDWARD BRUINVELS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
Keith Robert Malcouronne | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.61m | £14.33m | £15.01m | £16.15m | £14.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.99m | £13.55m | £14.32m | £14.87m | £15.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £137.00k | £106.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £294.00k | £100.00k | £87.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.16m | £12.36m | £12.60m | £13.64m | £12.48m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £483.00k | £572.00k | £699.00k | £651.00k | £621.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.34m | £663.00k | £761.00k | £1.18m | £676.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £632.00k | £521.00k | £562.00k | £679.00k | £749.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £214.00k | £385.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £34.00k | £0 | £1.00k | £602.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.72m | £13.07m | £13.68m | £14.28m | £14.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £270.00k | £480.00k | £643.00k | £594.00k | £639.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.00k | £75.00k | £100.00k | £50.00k | £227.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.11m | £1.04m | £1.06m | £1.55m | £1.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £41.00k | £70.00k | £0 | £0 | £372.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £136.97m | £146.26m | £186.56m | £197.73m | £186.22m | |
|
Long-term investments | £18.26m | £19.01m | £27.43m | £27.53m | £24.21m | |
|
Other assets | £5.16m | £8.09m | £9.57m | £10.97m | £11.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.24m | -£632.00k | -£287.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.44m | £6.94m | £8.19m | £8.86m | £8.54m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 22/10/1927 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2007 as amended on 15 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
4. THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1. TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE WORK, OBJECTS AND PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE DIOCESE; AND 4.2. TO AID AND FURTHER (IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE APPROVED BY RESOLUTION OF DIOCESAN SYNOD) THE OBJECTS AND WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OUTSIDE THE DIOCESE OR OF ANY OTHER BODY OF CHRISTIANS WHETHER INSIDE OR OUTSIDE THE DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church House Guildford
Stag Hill
GUILDFORD
GU2 7UP
- Phone:
- 01483790300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window