Financial history HASCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 248414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.75k £30.17k £18.08k £16.46k £20.24k
Total expenditure £15.98k £13.92k £14.54k £22.85k £17.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £17.91k £2.67k N/A £5.31k