THE BATH AND WELLS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote and assist the work and purposes of the Church of England in the Diocese of Bath and Wells; to organise and provide funds in aid of the work and ministry of the church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1966: Standard registration
  • 26 November 2017: Funds received from 1116341 TWERTON FELLOWSHIP
  • 21 November 2018: Funds received from 224866 THE ABBEY HOUSE, GLASTONBURY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Louise Slader Tucker Trustee 01 January 2025
CHARITY FOR MAINTENANCE OF CHURCHYARD AND OTHER PURPOSES
Received: On time
EXFORD HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF BATH AND WELLS BRANCH)
Received: On time
Elizabeth Renshaw-Ames Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Kevin Lawrence Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Rev Rona Stuart-Bourne Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Michael Hodson Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
The Ven Charles Scott Peer Trustee 01 September 2024
FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CHRIST CHURCH IN BATH
Received: On time
ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND
Received: On time
THE ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Toby Christopher Wright Trustee 16 June 2024
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST ANDREW IN WELLS
Recently registered
Hayden Lloyd Taylor Trustee 01 March 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
Revd Preb Narinder Tegally Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Rt Revd Noel Michael Roy Beasley Trustee 23 September 2022
THE PALACE TRUST
Received: On time
SARUM COLLEGE
Received: On time
ANGLICAN ALLIANCE
Received: On time
Rev Morey Alisdair Christopher Andrews Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WRAXALL WITH FAILAND
Received: On time
Robert Dean Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, YEOVIL, SOMERSET
Received: On time
Rev Ann Elizabeth Fulton Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev Richard James Miles Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Tracey Jane Khodabandehloo Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Dr Robert Michael Sage Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record
Philip Charles Edge Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Dr Caroline Frances Mason Trustee 01 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, NAILSEA
Received: On time
Dr AXEL ANTHONY PALMER Trustee 01 August 2018
SOMERSET CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL
Received: On time
WILLIAM WEBB
Received: On time
Marilyn Lee Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
James Loring Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Rev ROGER DRIVER Trustee 29 September 2017
None on record
The Ven Anne Gell Trustee 28 May 2017
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST ANDREW IN WELLS
Recently registered
THE WELLS CLERICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
The Ven Simon Hill Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Rev Ruth Worsley Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.29m £13.71m £12.13m £15.29m £15.60m
Total expenditure £14.50m £15.91m £15.58m £15.16m £15.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.25m £10.41m £10.23m £10.75m £10.49m
Income - Other trading activities £338.00k £447.00k £458.00k £797.00k £1.28m
Income - Charitable activities £729.00k £432.00k £646.00k £636.00k £686.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.42m £1.11m £298.00k £975.00k £1.19m
Income - Other £558.00k £1.31m £497.00k £2.13m £1.96m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.18m £15.20m £14.95m £14.91m £14.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £274.00k £248.00k £219.00k £251.00k £282.00k
Expenditure - Governance £42.00k £31.00k £29.00k £26.00k £44.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £880.00k £1.17m £1.22m £1.43m £862.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £175.00k £48.00k £23.00k £22.00k £35.00k
Expenditure - Other £41.00k £466.00k £408.00k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £67.17m £67.20m £67.45m £66.67m £66.26m
Long-term investments £43.37m £41.94m £44.20m £41.70m £38.36m
Other assets £5.75m £4.76m £5.23m £6.11m £6.91m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.46m -£907.00k -£604.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £11.18m £11.84m £11.39m £11.42m £6.36m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flourish House
2 Cathedral Avenue
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 1FD
Phone:
01749670777