CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upholding the doctrine of the Church of England and assisting clergy, parishes, schools and the like in their work and mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nigel Atkinson | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Stephen Short | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Pierce | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Edward John Gerald Keene | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Michael Hayden | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Reverend Doctor Jason David Ward | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Robert Speight Munro | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Paul John Towner | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev James Thomas HUGHES | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Amanda Robbie | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER RICHARD HARGAVE KILGOUR | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.08k | £232.54k | £301.03k | £270.88k | £319.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.21k | £264.58k | £270.65k | £285.08k | £304.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 APRIL 1926 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 1966, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 21/3/97 as amended on 11 Jun 2016 as amended on 13 May 2017 as amended on 12 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE DOCTRINE AND WORSHIP OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS SET FORTH IN THE 39 ARTICLES OF RELIGION AND THE BOOK OF COMMON PRAYER AS REVIEWED AND ADOPTED IN 1662 AND TO RUN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS. (FOR FULLER DETAILES SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION AS ALTERED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12TH JULY 1966).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BIRCHINGTON CONVALESCENT BENEFIT FUND
- DEAN WACE MEMORIAL FUND
- EMMANUEL CHURCH TRUST
- F M BEYNON TRUST
- G R BRIGSTOCKE TRUST
- GIRLING TRUST
- H C WELLS FOR AUGMENTATION OF LIVING
- HANSON BEQUEST, CHRIST CHURCH, SURBITON HILL TRUST, BACUP ST SAVIOUR'S ENDOWMENT FUND, OULTON LOWESTOFT TRUST AND CHARITY OF H H BOLTON
- HOLY TRINITY CHURCH HOVE TRUST
- LUTHER MEMORIAL HOME (LUTHER ANNUITIES)
- PADDOCK WOOD PAROCHIAL HALL TRUST
- ST JOHN'S CHURCH, WALTHAMSTOW
- ST LUKES, LEAMINGTON SPA (COLEMAN)
- ST LUKES, LEAMINGTON SPA (MRS FISHER)
- THE AMALGAMATED ORDINATION AND TRAINING FUND
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH CHRIST CHURCH LEAMINGTON SPA
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH CHURCH SOCIETY AND GLOUCESTER MARINERS CHURCH
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH CHURCH SOCIETY AND GLOUCESTER MARINERS HALL
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH PENRHYN HALL WALTHAMSTOW
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH ST FAITH'S MAIDSTONE
- THE CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHAPEL OF ST JAMES RYDE
- THE CHARITY OF EDWARD ALLEN BEYNON IN CONNECTION WITH CHURCH SOCIETY
- THE CHARITY OF THE WILL OF JOSEPH WILLIAM HANSON IN CONNECTION WITH CHURCH SOCIETY
- THE CHURCH SOCIETY TRUST ENDOWMENT FUND
- THE DUSSELDORF CHAPLAINCY
- THE LUCY THOMAS TRUST
- THE WILLIAM NEWTON TRUST
- 07 February 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor
Centre Block
Hille Business Estate
132 St Albans Road
Watford
UK
- Phone:
- 01923255410
- Email:
- admin@churchsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window