THE DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 249767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Board of Finance resources the Christian tasks of mission and ministry through parishes and other networks.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1966: Standard registration
  • 09 October 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IVOR PATRICK ANTHONY LEIGH Trustee 01 November 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY & CHRIST CHURCH, CHESTERFIELD
Received: On time
The Reverend Doctor Jason David Ward Trustee 01 November 2024
WILMOT, GILBERT AND BERRYSFORD CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, CHADDESDEN, DERBY
Received: On time
CHURCH SOCIETY
Received: On time
FELLOWSHIP OF WORD AND SPIRIT
Received: On time
Rev Bryony Ruthellen Taylor Trustee 01 November 2024
BARLBOROUGH HOSPITAL
Received: On time
WILLIAM COOKE
Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
FREEDOM COMMUNITY PROJECT
Received: On time
Canon Emily Brailsford Trustee 01 November 2024
CENTRAL READERS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
The Reverend Doctor James Hughes Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
The Reverend Doctor Nicola Mary McNally Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
The Venerable Nicola Jane Fenton Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Canon Christine Mary Holmes-Elener Trustee 04 July 2022
DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
FREDERICK JOHN GASCOYNE Trustee 04 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHESTERFIELD
Received: On time
The Venerable Matthew Trick Trustee 12 June 2022
None on record
Rev Daniel Benedict Cooke Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Venerable Karen Elizabeth Hamblin Trustee 04 November 2021
THE CHURCH ON THE BUS
Received: On time
The Honourable David Piers Carlis Legh Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Peter Anthony Kelsey Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
The Right Reverend William Malcolm Macnaughton Trustee 18 April 2021
LOVE BURUNDI
Received: On time
DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
PETER COWLEY AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Dr Peter Robinson Trustee 19 July 2020
CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, DERBY
Recently registered
Canon Julian Francis Hollywell Trustee 14 October 2019
SAINT WERBURGH SPONDON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
SPONDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE RT REVD ELIZABETH JANE HOLDEN LANE Trustee 11 February 2019
DERBY DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
BRIAN ARTHUR PARKER Trustee 18 November 2015
None on record
Madalaine Thomas-Goddard Trustee 09 November 2013
None on record
Christine Elizabeth McMullen Trustee 09 November 2013
MOTHERS UNION (DIOCESE OF DERBY BRANCH)
Received: On time
MR M J TITTERTON Trustee 09 May 2013
ALL SAINTS DERBY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MR J COOPER Trustee 09 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.95m £9.92m £10.19m £9.71m £9.91m
Total expenditure £9.69m £8.94m £9.45m £9.66m £9.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £53.78k £711 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.65m £6.30m £6.11m £6.53m £6.53m
Income - Other trading activities £280.81k £344.00k £382.89k £489.49k £448.33k
Income - Charitable activities £559.31k £783.72k £474.08k £479.89k £432.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.78m £1.72m £1.75m £1.94m £2.34m
Income - Other £1.68m £772.72k £1.47m £275.28k £160.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £488.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.59m £8.84m £9.32m £9.38m £9.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.35k £100.02k £129.23k £282.41k £161.52k
Expenditure - Governance £56.30k £47.78k £58.91k £61.32k £64.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.15m £966.43k £0 £0 £991.91k
Expenditure - Investment management £98.35k £100.02k £129.23k £282.41k £161.52k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.09k £0 £22.50k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £31.53m £31.46m £31.22m £31.61m £32.04m
Long-term investments £55.81m £59.03m £66.01m £59.40m £63.25m
Other assets £5.41m £6.02m £7.03m £13.40m £13.08m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£493.00k -£132.00k -£87.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.29m £1.20m £996.56k £812.38k £877.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RESOLUTION 23 FEBRUARY 1928.
Charitable objects
THE ERECTION OF DUAL PURPOSE BUILDINGS, NEW CHURCHES AND PARSONAGE HOUSES IN NEW AREAS.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF DERBY
Registration history
  • 17 October 1966 : Standard registration
  • 09 October 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
The Derby Diocesan Board of Finance
Ltd
Church House
Full Street
DERBY
DE1 3DR
Phone:
01332388650