THE GOSPEL STANDARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support Gospel Standard churches and charities with grants, loans and advice and for the publishing of Christian literature to promote the gospel throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 April 1994: Standard registration
- GOSPEL STANDARD TRUST PUBLICATIONS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JAMES CHRISTIAN | Chair | 03 May 1991 |
|
|
||||||||
Malcolm John Lee | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
EDMUND ROBERT CHARLES BUSS | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
PHILIP JOHN POCOCK | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|||||||||
HENRY SANT | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
TIMOTHY JAMES PARISH | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
DR MATTHEW JAMES HYDE | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW CROWTER | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN ARTHUR HYDE | Trustee | 23 May 1980 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.64k | £52.16k | £100.64k | £71.90k | £91.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.29k | £115.93k | £110.10k | £114.43k | £124.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 1966 AND AMENDED 20 JANUARY 1979, 15 FEBRUARY 1979 AND 21 MAY 2005 as amended on 11 Sep 2021 as amended on 21 Sep 2021 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
4 Objects The objects for which the Company is established are:- 4.1 To assist Gospel Standard Churches and Congregations subscribing to the Articles of Faith of the Gospel Standard Strict and Particular Baptists (the Articles of Faith) in the furtherance of their religion and charitable work. 4.2 To assist with the appointment of trustees and with necessary legal advice, and/or repairs, maintenance or sale of any buildings or land relating to Gospel Standard Chapels. 4.3 To support such of the following as are charities: The Gospel Standard Aid and Poor Relief Society, The Gospel Standard Bethesda Fund, The Gospel Standard Publications Fund, The Gadsby Memorial Christmas Fund, The Library of the Gospel Standard Baptists and any other charitable trust or fund approved by the Executive Committee.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 11 April 1994 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAVEPITS HOUSE
MARLE PLACE ROAD
BRENCHLEY
TONBRIDGE
TN12 7HS
- Phone:
- 01892722184
- Email:
- GSTRUST@PLAYFOOT.NET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window