YWCA OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE,IN PARTICULAR YOUNG WOMEN UNDER 30,THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION AND TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THEIR POVERTY OR HARDSHIP, WORKING FROM A CHRISTIAN VALUE BASE. TO ENCOURAGE THE SOCIAL,PHYSICAL,SPIRITUAL AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO PROMOTE THE LEADERSHIP AND PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY OF YOUNG WOMEN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 April 1998: Standard registration
- 22 March 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YWCA (Working name)
- THE YOUNG WOMEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN (THE UNINCORPORATED BODY) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERICA LEWIS | Chair | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ilona Florence Brannen | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Anna Lee | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Josephine Swords | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ann Kelly | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.45k | £148.91k | £29.11k | £158 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.66k | £10.42k | £774 | £274 | £274 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/10/1987 AS AMENDED ON 24/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/1992 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2015 as amended on 01 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELEGION AMONG WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF EITHER SEX,TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION,TO RELIEVE THEIR POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 09 April 1998 : Standard registration
- 22 March 2001 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Mariner Way
Lancaster
LA1 5TS
- Phone:
- 07479859470
- Email:
- josie.swords@ywca.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window