Financial history NIDD ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 250418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £39.95k £35.68k £39.27k £45.01k £39.37k
Total expenditure £26.14k £38.51k £67.24k £25.12k £40.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A