INCORPORATED COUNCIL OF LAW REPORTING FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 250605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preparation and publication, in a convenient form, at a moderate price, and under gratuitous Professional control, of [The Law] Reports of Judicial Decisions of the Superior and Appellate Courts in England and Wales

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Anguilla
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Barbados
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Bermuda
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Canada
  • Cayman Islands
  • China
  • Cyprus
  • Denmark
  • Dominican Republic
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Grenada
  • Guyana
  • Hong Kong
  • India
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Kenya
  • Malaysia
  • Malta
  • Mauritius
  • Montserrat
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Nigeria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Russia
  • Saint Vincent
  • Scotland
  • Singapore
  • Solomon Islands
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Taiwan
  • The Bahamas
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • United States
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ICLR (Working name)
  • THE LAW REPORTS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD JOHN HUGO FLECK CBE Chair 19 October 2012
THE MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE MALAYSIA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARLBURIAN CLUB CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
Lucy Clementine Moores Rigby MP Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Richard James Francis Atkinson Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Richard Hermer Trustee 05 July 2024
None on record
Mark Stephen Anderson Trustee 08 July 2022
None on record
Abigail Jessica Bright Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Professor James Simon Francis Lee Trustee 02 August 2021
BALLIOL COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Recently registered
Muhammad Faisel Sadiq Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Dr Mary Margaret Malecka Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Jamie Clarke Trustee 14 February 2019
None on record
LINDA KAREN HADFIELD LEE Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
Sushila Abraham Trustee 14 September 2016
THE MAYOR'S CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Received: On time
Kenneth Hamer Trustee 14 June 2016
None on record
Peter Joseph Susman QC Trustee 03 May 2016
None on record
SARAH THOMAS Trustee 19 April 2013
None on record
SIR MARK GEORGE TURNER Trustee 26 February 2013
None on record
SIR ALASTAIR HUBERT NORRIS Trustee 18 October 2012
QVSR SEAFARERS CENTRES
Received: On time
MARGARET RUTH BOWRON QC Trustee
None on record
SIR PETER MARCEL ROTH Trustee
ALLIANCE FOR LAWYERS AT RISK CIO
Received: On time
HIS HONOUR JUDGE DAVID HODGE QC Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.15m £5.26m £5.43m £5.70m £5.95m
Total expenditure £4.77m £4.67m £4.87m £5.17m £5.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.03m £5.20m £5.35m £5.56m £5.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £63.74k £53.09k £48.47k £75.28k £153.79k
Income - Other £55.50k £13.88k £37.52k £60.14k £58.85k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.77m £4.67m £4.87m £5.17m £5.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.45k £12.45k £14.00k £15.75k £18.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.81m £1.87m £1.85m £1.72m £1.64m
Long-term investments £2.42m £2.54m £3.53m £3.19m £3.54m
Other assets £3.48m £3.95m £3.55m £3.91m £4.56m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.07m -£2.04m £25.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.54m £3.61m £3.50m £3.54m £3.63m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
I C L R
MEGARRY HOUSE
119 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1PP
Phone:
02072426471