ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church organisation who seek to fulfil our objectives through extensive relevant programs both in the UK and overseas. Our expanding operations are mainly conducted through National Departments, approximately 500 churches in the UK and in 58 countries overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£78,855,130
Donations and legacies | £55.51m | |
Charitable activities | £146.02k | |
Other trading activities | £22.03m | |
Investments | £1.17m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£72,619,682
Raising funds | £566.62k | |
Charitable activities | £72.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,317,189 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,646,066 from 4 government contract(s) and £729,680 from 54 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £566.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £72.05m | |
Retained for future use | £6.24m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £566.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £72.05m | |
Retained for future use | £8.55m |
People

1440 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
10000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Egypt
- France
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Lithuania
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Paraguay
- Philippines
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 February 1967: Standard registration
- 15 June 2012: Funds received from 1090116 POWERHOUSE CHURCH, MARCH
- 19 October 2012: Funds received from 1115463 WOODBANK EVANGELICAL CHURCH WHITEHAVEN
- 15 November 2012: Funds received from 1058644 PERSONAL CHOICE
- 25 June 2014: Funds received from 514512 THE CHRISTIAN LIFE CENTRE
- 06 October 2014: Funds received from 518763 BETHANY COMMUNITY CHURCHES
- 07 November 2014: Funds received from 1139364 BUDE NEW LIFE CENTRE
- 15 January 2015: Funds received from 1138818 BETHEL CHURCH (OLDBURY)
- 07 February 2017: Funds received from 1151228 ELIM CHURCH PHEASEY TRUST
- 05 November 2018: Funds received from 288001 HOPE TRUST WELLINGBOROUGH
- 19 March 2019: Funds received from 1128314 KSA EDUCATION & TRAINING
- 28 March 2019: Funds received from 1092396 ASIAN FOCUS
- 23 April 2019: Funds received from 1109723 KETTERING PERSPECTIVE TRUST
- 25 July 2019: Funds received from 1143927 ALLSTARS PLAYGROUP
- 16 September 2019: Funds received from 1149021 SAFE FROM SLAVERY LTD
- 12 January 2021: Funds received from 1107129 THE COMMUNITY CHURCH (IW)
- 19 April 2021: Funds received from 327205 THE 40 - 3 TRUST
- 12 August 2021: Funds received from 1189554 LIFT THE LID
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- 06 December 2023: Funds received from 1152310 INTENTIONAL HEALTH
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
- 14 February 2025: Funds received from 1040413 OASIS CHURCH ANGLESEY TRUST
- 12 March 2025: Funds received from 1159997 WORD OF LIFE BIBLE CHURCH
- ELIM (Working name)
- ELIM CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- ELIM CHURCH (Working name)
- ELIM PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Pugh | Chair | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kojo Wood | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Mark Gordon Ryan | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Harold Frederick Afflu | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michelle Ann Nunn | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen John Ball | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edwin William Michael | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dominic Neil Lyndon De Souza | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW PAUL HUDSON | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev DUNCAN JAMES CLARK | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES JEFFREY GLASS | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev STUART BLOUNT | Trustee |
|
||||||
The Elim Trust Corporation | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev DAVID CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.87m | £65.94m | £64.57m | £69.75m | £78.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.70m | £62.95m | £61.14m | £69.09m | £72.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.59m | £5.86m | £4.53m | £4.63m | £4.65m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.19m | £1.40m | £757.32k | £729.68k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £48.27m | £47.69m | £49.58m | £50.05m | £55.51m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £21.05m | £16.90m | £14.00m | £18.70m | £22.03m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £700.91k | £739.70k | £380.15k | £616.60k | £146.02k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £605.89k | £605.89k | £605.89k | £383.69k | £1.17m | |
|
Income - Other | £239.45k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £420.40k | £344.21k | £383.05k | £630.71k | £775.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £66.97m | £62.27m | £59.41m | £67.98m | £72.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £731.44k | £678.54k | £450.28k | £564.94k | £566.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.24m | £1.39m | £3.47m | £3.60m | £3.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £347.11k | £1.01m | £2.60m | £2.66m | £2.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £1.28m | £552.98k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £192.15m | £193.14m | £189.33m | £187.93m | £187.74m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.63m | £8.63m | £7.36m | £7.36m | £9.68m | |
|
Other assets | £20.20m | £23.09m | £30.00m | £33.16m | £32.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£35.36m | -£31.06m | -£30.01m | -£20.22m | -£7.32m | |
|
Total liabilities | £47.09m | £46.71m | £44.19m | £44.67m | £37.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION CONTAINED IN DEED POLL DATED 10TH APRIL 1934 AND THE RULES AND REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 14TH JANUARY 1942 AS AMENDED 1971/72, 1988/89, 1989/90, 1993/94, 1995/96,1998/99, 1999/2000, 2004, 2007. AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO SPREAD AND PROPAGATE THE FULL GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE FOUNDATIONAL TRUTHS HEREINAFTER FOURTHLY SET FORTH; 2. TO DEMONSTRATE THE FULL GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST BY THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, AGE, INFIRMITY, SICKNESS, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR CARING RESPONSIBILITIES HAVE A NEED OF HEALTH, SOCIAL CARE OR OTHER RELATED COMMUNITY SERVICES OR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THOSE NEEDS; AND 3. TO DEMONSTRATE THE FULL GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elim International Centre
De Walden Road
West Malvern
Malvern
WR14 4DF
- Phone:
- 0345 302 6750
- Email:
- info@elim.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window