Skip to main content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Register of Charities
englishcymraeg
Log in to online services
  1. Home
Search

Linked charities CHINLEY INDEPENDENT CHAPEL PROPERTY CHARITY

Charity number: 251667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Skip to Content
  • Charity overview
  • What, who, how, where
  • Governance
  • Trustees
  • Financial history
  • Accounts and annual returns
  • Governing document
  • Linked charities
  • Contact information
Linked charities
  • DAY AND SUNDAY SCHOOL
  • DORIS WATERHOUSE
  • DR ROBERT OTTIWELL GIFFORD BENNET
  • DR THOMAS SLACKE CHARITY FOR CHAPEL
  • DR THOMAS SLACKE FOR CHOIR
  • DR THOMAS SLACKE FOR ORGANIST
  • GEORGE SHEPHERD
  • JOHN MELLOR
  • MISS M A BRADDOCK
  • MRS ANN SLACKE
  • MRS CATHERINE BAGSHAWE
  • MRS ELIZABETH MELLOR
  • PROPERTY COMPRISED IN CONVEYANCE DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1891
  • PROPERTY COMPRISED IN INDENTURE DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1770 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 28TH AUGUST 1962
  • PROPERTY COMPRISED IN INDENTURE DATED 3RD JULY 1712 (EXCLUDING THE CHAPEL)
  • REVEREND WILLIAM BAGSHAWE
  • SAMUEL WOOD FOR DISTRIBUTION OF BREAD IN CHINLEY CHAPEL
  • SAMUEL WOOD FOR MINISTER OF CHINLEY CHAPEL
  • THOMAS MOULT
  • WILLIAM BENNETT
Linked charity 251667-10 DAY AND SUNDAY SCHOOL
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1891
Charitable objects
SUNDAY SCHOOL IN CONNECTION WITH CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 November 1967 : Standard registration
  • 04 December 1991 : Removed

Print charity details Loading
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

  • Cookies
  • Accessibility
All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated
© Crown copyright