SARAH RACHAEL TITFORD'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to accepted beneficiaries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 January 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lucy Helen Wright | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graham Noyce | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David H Marshall-Jones | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOE Igunnubole | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY GEORGE ALDERMAN ACII | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Barbara Mary Spittle | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|||||
REVEREND ROB POWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.80k | £10.78k | £9.06k | £10.57k | £8.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.04k | £9.78k | £9.79k | £11.01k | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 24 JUNE 1843 VARIED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEMES DATED 27 AUGUST 1897, 13 NOVEMBER 1900, 24 DECEMBER 1968 AND 24 OCTOBER 1975
Charitable objects
FOR AND TOWARDS THE PECUNIARY ASSISTANCE, CLOTHING, MEDICINE, INSTRUCTION NECESSITIES, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE UNDER CASUALTIES FROM HURT, ACCIDENT OR OTHER CAUSE OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF 12 OR MORE POOR WIDOWS AND 6 OR ++MORE POOR MAIDEN WOMEN AGED 60 YEARS OR UPWARDS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDING AT THE TIME OF ELECTION IN LONDON, WESTMINSTER, BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK OR WITHIN 10 MILES FROM THE STANDARD IN CORNHILL. IF AT ANY TIME THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE UNABLE TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF WIDOWS OR MAIDEN WOMEN OF OF GOOD CHARACTER OF THE AGE OF 60 YEARS OR UPWARDS RESIDENT IN THE AREA MENTIONED IN THE SAID WILL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE SAID WILL AS AFFECTED BY THE LAST PRECEDING CLAUSE HEREOF THEY MAY APPLY THE SAME IN LIKE MANNER FOR THE BENEFIT OF WIDOWS OR MAIDEN WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER OF THE AGE OF 60 YEARS OR UPWARDS RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN GREATER LONDON
Area of benefit
LONDON, WESTMINSTER AND BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Linked charities
- 23 January 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Fordbridge Road
Sunbury-on-Thames
TW16 6AH
- Phone:
- 01932787186
- Email:
- b.spittle@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window