THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY INCORPORATED 1902

Charity Number: 253659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the society is the transcribing, printing and publishing of the heraldic visitations of counties, parish registers or any manuscripts relating to genealogy, family history and heraldry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,001
Total expenditure: £3,182

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY (Working name)
  • HARLEIAN SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY INCORPORATED 1902 (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir THOMAS WOODCOCK KCVO DL Chair 31 July 1996
COLLEGE OF ARMS TRUST
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE PARISH REGISTER SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
SLAIDBURN ARCHIVE
Received: On time
Dr Phillip Alan Bone Trustee 28 June 2023
BRITISH RECORD SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Dominic Charles Davenport Ingram Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN ROGERS Trustee 20 June 2018
MONUMENTAL BRASS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Nicolas John Bell Trustee 21 June 2017
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BENEDICTS, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
VAUGHAN WILLIAMS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Giles Howard Mandelbrote Trustee 17 June 2015
THE WALPOLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
PRINTING HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
KATHARINE OWEN MVO Trustee 18 June 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD PURY CUST Trustee 01 October 2012
None on record
ALAN ROGER DICKINS Trustee 19 June 2012
None on record
MR JOE EDWARDS Trustee 25 June 2002
FOUNDATION FOR MEDIEVAL GENEALOGY
Received: On time
Timothy Hugh Stewart Duke CVO Trustee 08 February 1989
THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY
Received: On time
CAROL PENELOPE HARTLEY Trustee 12 May 1987
None on record
Dr ADRIAN PETER AILES Trustee 12 May 1987
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.97k £6.22k £4.79k £4.82k £6.00k
Total expenditure £2.79k £9.24k £2.36k £2.50k £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COLLEGE OF ARMS
130 QUEEN VICTORIA STREET
LONDON
EC4V 4BT
Phone:
02072482762