Financial history THE CHICHESTER HALL

Charity number: 254965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £22.30k £51.56k £51.56k £25.78k £46.23k
Total expenditure £16.93k £37.15k £37.15k £30.56k £60.57k
Income from government contracts N/A £470 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £43.71k N/A N/A N/A