Financial history THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 255205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £146.13k £131.93k £134.26k £141.39k £147.18k
Total expenditure £166.86k £154.63k £157.24k £161.68k £165.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A