Financial history CROSBY GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 257348
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023
Total gross income £20.77k £10.36k £5.50k £9.26k £19.93k
Total expenditure £12.16k £8.20k £2.58k £13.35k £12.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A