THE BRADFORD FESTIVAL CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1856, Bradford Festival Choral Society is Bradford's oldest and largest auditioned choir. Our aim has always been to educate and entertain the people of Bradford by affording opportunities to perform or appreciate music from the choral repertory. As well as performing the established choral classics, we also explore new works and sometimes music of a lighter type.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 10 April 1969: Standard registration
- 18 July 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 July 2012: Funds transferred to 1141596 BRADFORD FESTIVAL CHORAL SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.72k | £17.60k | £12.15k | £11.41k | £18.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £35.55k | £21.85k | £16.28k | £11.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 20 March 2011 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 04 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 08 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 17TH SEPTEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED MARCH 1996 AND 24 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE AND SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window