THE HINDU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All religious occasions & festivals are celebrated every year. To promote religious activities to the youngster. Invite school children to help with their R.E. class. Running regular groups for the elderly to meet for luncheon club and various activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sangeeta Sharma | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kailash Vati Sarda | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Savtantar Hargun | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vineet Kumar Pathak | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chiragi Solanki | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.35k | £34.64k | £94.89k | £77.64k | £143.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.50k | £51.80k | £74.24k | £89.10k | £82.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.10k | £8.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2025 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2025 | 169 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE MANDIR ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION IN LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRINCIPALS OF THE HINDU RELIGION PROVIDED THAT THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY MAKE REGULATIONS TO ALLOW RESIDENTS FROM AREAS BEYOND LEEDS AND IT'S SURROUNDING AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO FACILITIES FOR HINDU WORSHIP TO BE TREATED AS THOUGH THEY WERE RESIDENT WITHIN THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE OF THE HINDU FAITH. (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR SUCH INHABITANTS FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Temple
36 Alexandra Road
Leeds
LS6 1RF
- Phone:
- 01132307106
- Email:
- leedsmandir@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
leedsmandir.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window