ALLIANCE FAMILY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to a general range of charitable causes including the advancement of education and religion and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 28 May 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD DAVID ALLIANCE CBE | Chair | 11 December 1968 |
|
|
||||
Lady Homa Alliance | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|||||
HON JOSHUA JACOB MOSHE ALLIANCE | Trustee | 30 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
HON SARA DORN ESTERKIN | Trustee | 12 July 1984 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33m | £1.26m | £1.81m | £1.01m | £13.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.38k | £273.39k | £242.56k | £204.59k | £151.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.00m | £1.25m | £1.80m | £1.00m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £331.74k | £10.69k | £11.25k | £12.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £297.74k | £269.35k | £192.69k | £196.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £63.64k | £4.04k | £49.87k | £8.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £86.26k | £104.81k | £116.73k | £99.80k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.32k | £1.74k | £5.33k | £2.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH DECEMBER 1968 AND AMENDED 24TH APRIL 1969 AND BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALLIANCE FAMILY FOUNDATION LIMITED
SUITE 1B MACLAREN HOUSE
LANCASTRIAN OFFICE CENTRE
TALBOT ROAD
MANCHESTER
M32 0FP
- Phone:
- 02074937735
- Email:
- aff@alliance.me
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window