BRAYFORD TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has care of the important and historic Brayford Pool which is situated in the centre of Lincoln. It is the hub of the Lincolnshire waterways. From income generated by mooring and leasing fees it aims to maintain and improve the Pool and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £30,784 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 October 1969: Standard registration
- BRAYFORD TRUST (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Peter Anderson | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Tweddle | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Trevor Hewson | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Julian Richard Free CBE | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JACKSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH WILLIAM DARWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK WELLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ALBERT COSTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.63k | £279.24k | £296.85k | £259.14k | £311.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.46k | £147.97k | £199.25k | £208.34k | £233.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £82.52k | £25.00k | N/A | £30.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/11/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE NATURAL ARTISTIC CULTURAL AND RECREATIONAL AMENITIES OF THE BRAYFORD MERE IN THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
BRAYFORD POOL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brayford Trust
3 Campus Way
LINCOLN
LN6 7GA
- Phone:
- 01522521452
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window