THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, BRIGHTLINGSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising for the repair ,maintenance and improvement of the ancient Church of All Saints Brightlingsea which houses unique memorial tiles to local sailors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 01 January 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imogen Maytum | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Caroline Evelyn Beckett | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Foss-Smith | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Neil John Christopher Ballard | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Vivien Chapman | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||
LYNN BALLARD | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
MR RAY STOLLERY | Trustee | 21 October 1997 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY GIRLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JANET RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £11.06k | £8.67k | £89.43k | £21.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.41k | £7.11k | £6.53k | £83.33k | £11.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2025 | 323 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH OCTOBER 1969 AS AMENDED ON 21ST OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE HISTORIC ALL SAINTS CHURCH BRIGHTLINGSEA AND THE PROTECTION AND AUGMENTATION OF THE AMENITIES OF THE CHURCH AND ITS SURROUNDINGS TOGETHER WITH THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION RENEWAL AND AUGMENTATION OF ALL FURNITURE FITTINGS AND OTHER CHATTELS OF THE SAID CHURCH BY GRANTS TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL.
Area of benefit
ALL SAINTS CHURCH, BRIGHTLINGSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Queen Street
BRIGHTLINGSEA
COLCHESTER
Brightlingsea
uk
CO7 0JD
- Phone:
- 07939960420
- Email:
- imogen.maytum@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window