BISHOP SKIRLAUGH (OTHERWISE CALLED THE CHAPEL ESTATE)

Charity number: 260509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Bishop Skirlaugh Charity was given by Walter de Skirlaw, formerly Bishop of Durham, the founder and builder of the church, for the repairs and maintenance thereof.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £21,175
Total expenditure: £2,207

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Harry Messer Trustee 01 March 2022
CHARITY OF PETER NEVILL
Received: On time
MARMADUKE LANGDALE CHARITY
Received: On time
Judith Ann Stott Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
CATHERINE HELEN CRUMPTON Trustee 19 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.20k £15.98k £16.63k £18.61k £21.18k
Total expenditure £4.77k £9.64k £7.34k £2.31k £2.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Church View
Church lane
Skirlaugh
HU11 5HF
Phone:
01964562885
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available