THE SAMUEL GARDNER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music and Arts, with an emphasis on the advancement of music and music education generally with an emphasis on the encouragement of young people; support for the arts and heritage; the preservation of trees, gardens etc to provide open spaces, public walks etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 June 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Friend | Chair |
|
||||||
Gillon Cameron | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Charlotte Drever | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Davy | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JAMES RAMPLEY | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|||||
DR URSULA JONES OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.29k | £39.27k | £47.16k | £47.43k | £73.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.78k | £54.13k | £50.24k | £53.57k | £59.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST APRIL 1970
Charitable objects
UPON SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HARROW-ON-THE-HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MARCHMONT ROAD
RICHMOND
TW10 6HQ
- Phone:
- 07790543144
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window