AL - MEDINA TRUST

Charity number: 261188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help in Education and needy and relief of poverty globally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £164,041
Total expenditure: £96,395

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ziaul Haq Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record
Mohammed Saeed Trustee 11 February 2018
None on record
FAROOQ SALMAN MURAD Trustee 11 February 2018
INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION (IDF)
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
MADINA TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARKFIELD INSTITUTE OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Received: On time
Deaf Muslim UK
Received: On time
Ismail Gitay Trustee 03 September 2016
AS-SIRAAT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr ZAHID ALI PARVEZ Trustee 22 April 2014
THE ISLAMIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ISLAMIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MADINA TRUST
Received: On time
DR MANAZIR AHSAN Trustee 24 October 2013
THE ISLAMIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARKFIELD INSTITUTE OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Received: On time
SARWAR JEHAN AND AZRA KHURSHID CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £141.42k £152.92k £147.84k £163.01k £164.04k
Total expenditure £70.54k £88.65k £70.90k £45.71k £96.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MARKFIELD CONFERENCE CENTRE
RATBY LANE
MARKFIELD
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE67 9SY
Phone:
01530244944
Website:

No information available