Financial history THE BAILY THOMAS CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 262334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.27m £1.78m £1.79m £1.89m £2.05m
Total expenditure £3.39m £3.40m £2.69m £3.00m £3.46m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £102.83k £120.23k £120.23k £120.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.95m £1.35m £1.54m £1.46m £1.86m
Income - Other £327.56k £319.28k £131.96k £311.04k £61.17k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.24m £3.30m £2.57m £2.89m £3.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £150.82k £108.53k £111.33k £110.37k £113.99k
Expenditure - Governance £117.78k £95.18k £95.59k £109.94k £113.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.95m £3.03m £2.29m £2.58m £3.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £150.82k £108.53k £111.33k £110.37k £113.99k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0