Financial history THE MARLOW SOCIETY

Charity Number: 262803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.53k £3.59k £4.07k £6.94k £8.19k
Total expenditure £3.09k £2.48k £3.17k £9.22k £6.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A