THE SEALED KNOT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes awareness of the British Civil Wars by performing battle re-enactments; giving educational talks; creating displays; taking part in commemorative & memorial events; and supporting of the preservation of historical battlefield sites. Promotes research into, and increase public interest in, the 17th century and history more widely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
2500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Charles Jackson | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Barry George | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jon Edward Courtney-Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ross Galen Tooke | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Elizabeth Pearce | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hannah Wright | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Rebecca Harrington | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Winsor-Gray | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Keith Thompson | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Daniel Phelps | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Iain Harrington | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Sales | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Cameron Henry James North-Bates | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Norman Parkes | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Ian Pearce | Trustee | 29 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Sidney Robinson | Trustee | 29 August 2015 |
|
|||||
BARRIE ARTHUR UPTON | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.50k | £69.19k | £78.67k | £108.05k | £147.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.93k | £53.61k | £64.30k | £132.62k | £143.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH JUNE 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13TH JULY 1980 AND 26TH AUGUST 1985 AND 27TH AUGUST 1989 AND 25TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO AND THE STUDY OF AND PUBLIC INTEREST IN HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Clarke Willmott LLP
Burlington House
Bottleigh Grange Business Park
Hedge End
Southampton
SO30 2AF
- Phone:
- 03452091556
- Email:
- info@thesealedknot.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window