Governing document BRAILLE CHESS ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/10/1970 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/1997 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2014 as amended on 17 Mar 2018 as amended on 26 Oct 2021 as amended on 16 Mar 2024 as amended on 15 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AMONG THE BLIND IN RELATION TO THE GAME OF CHESS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD OCTOBER 1970).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.