ORAL HEALTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE TO THE PUBLIC THE BENEFITS OF ACHIEVING AND MAINTAINING HIGH STANDARDS OF ORAL HEALTH. THE MISSION STATEMENT OF THE BRITISH DENTAL HEALTH FOUNDATION IS TO IMPROVE ORAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING IMPARTIAL AND INDEPENDENT ADVICE, INFORMATION AND EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£998,130
Donations and legacies | £249.34k | |
Charitable activities | £732.35k | |
Other trading activities | £450 | |
Investments | £16.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,070,055
Raising funds | £5.11k | |
Charitable activities | £1.06m | |
Other | £0 |
-£9,345 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.06m |
People

11 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 1971: Standard registration
- 18 August 2017: Funds received from 272448 BRITISH FEDERATION AGAINST SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DI...
- BRITISH DENTAL HEALTH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE PRESERVATION OF DENTAL HEALTH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Hay | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Waller | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ravindra Rattan | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Soha Dattani | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brady | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tomlinson | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgios Tsakos | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathon Timothy Newton | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Juliette Reeves | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Balser | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mhari Coxon | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £983.24k | £904.56k | £941.98k | £998.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10m | £1.03m | £858.91k | £941.53k | £1.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.81k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £292.41k | £236.87k | £252.53k | £228.66k | £249.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £9.00k | £2.00k | £2.60k | £450 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £791.86k | £694.30k | £598.03k | £689.36k | £732.35k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.11k | £15.27k | £13.25k | £18.21k | £16.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £9.00k | £27.81k | £38.76k | £3.15k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.10m | £1.03m | £853.38k | £935.23k | £1.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.22k | £4.69k | £5.53k | £6.31k | £5.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £57.24k | £55.15k | £55.87k | £55.88k | £75.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.22k | £4.69k | £5.53k | £6.31k | £5.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £242.98k | £233.63k | £231.20k | £220.14k | £214.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £624.90k | £580.08k | £737.96k | £719.93k | £592.39k | |
|
Other assets | £454.84k | £394.33k | £434.51k | £385.21k | £419.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £138.91k | £127.09k | £176.90k | £129.49k | £111.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/1971 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/12/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE FOUNDATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO IMPROVE THE ORAL HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO EDUCATE THE COMMUNITY IN THE BENEFITS OF ACHIEVING AND MAINTAINING A HIGH STANDARD OF ORAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oral Health Foundation
Smile House
2A East Union Street
RUGBY
CV226AJ
- Phone:
- 01788546365
- Email:
- mail@dentalhealth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window