Financial history THE WICK THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 263310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £50.78k £2.94k £1.53k £16.84k £11.01k
Total expenditure £12.60k £4.67k £10.82k £19.20k £20.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A