Financial history PROVINCIAL GRAND MASTER'S SPECIAL FUND

Charity number: 263805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.36k £1.48k £3.94k £2.75k £3.16k
Total expenditure £995 £255 £288 £24 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A