Financial history THE STRACHEY TRUST

Charity Number: 263845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.31k £3.83k £4.78k £4.63k £4.59k
Total expenditure £1.26k £9.75k £10.45k £8.70k £12.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A