THE BUBBLE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make theatre with and for children, teenagers and adults of South London. Speech Bubbles helps children in primary schools who have problems communicating. YTM sees at risk teenagers develop as workshop leaders. Intergenerational projects share the stories of our place. Fan Made Theatre invites audiences to select professional outdoor family theatre, and year round we run workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,885 from 9 government contract(s) and £4,181 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 August 1972: Standard registration
- LONDON BUBBLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Sonnex | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Abimbola Apalara | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Holden | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Grace Arogundade | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Miles Jason Webber | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
ANNA MARY SHIELDS | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ourania Pauline Marandos | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Cheltenham | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tinashe Sithole | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £531.47k | £592.37k | £453.56k | £365.54k | £346.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600.63k | £517.32k | £494.20k | £413.03k | £424.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.86k | £26.20k | £45.95k | £36.90k | £54.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | £99.29k | £201.33k | £54.82k | £30.89k | £4.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £377.30k | £461.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £38.77k | £6.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £115.40k | £67.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5 | £1 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £57.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £579.63k | £496.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £21.00k | £21.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.16k | £31.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JUNE 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 9TH OCTOBER 1989 as amended on 27 Jan 2021 as amended on 06 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF THE ART OF THEATRE AND MUSIC (INCLUDING THEATRE, MUSIC HALL, OPERA, MUSIC, DRAMA, BALLET AND ALL ART FORMS CONSISTING IN WHOLE OR IN PART OF WORDS AND/OR MUSIC) PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THEATRICAL COMPANIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lucy Bradshaw
3-5 ELEPHANT LANE
LONDON
SE16 4JD
- Phone:
- 02072374434
- Email:
- admin@londonbubble.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window