MADRON (WAR MEMORIAL) NURSES' HOME

Charity number: 265250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GENERAL CHARITABLE ACTIVITY PRINCIPALLY FOR THE RESIDENTS OF MADRON PARISH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,842
Total expenditure: £12,633

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MADRON (WAR MEMORIAL) (Working name)
  • NURSES HOME (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Jon Elliott Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
FELICITY ANN JENKIN Trustee 06 August 2013
None on record
SHEILA LORAINE WILSON Trustee 06 August 2013
None on record
CHARLES RANDAL FRIGGENS Trustee
FOUNDATION KNOWN AS DANIEL'S SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF MADRON
Received: On time
COLONEL SIR EDWARD BOLITHO OBE Trustee
CORNWALL RED SQUIRREL PROJECT
Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
THE ROYAL CORNWALL AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.62k £6.12k £7.75k £13.21k £10.84k
Total expenditure £3.51k £0 £0 £3.23k £12.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Seafields
PAIGNTON
TQ4 6NY
Phone:
01803845918
Website:

No information available