Witterings Community Minibus

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides community transport for the elderly, infirm and disabled in the Witterings, Birdham, Itchenor, Bracklesham and Almodington district of West Susssex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 November 1973: Standard registration
- WEST MANHOOD MINI-BUS (Working name)
- WEST MANHOOD VENTURERS (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Mary Bennett | Chair | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Judith Buckland | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
TREVOR ERNEST JAMES | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Geoffrey Ronald Breeze | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Sylvia Rebecca Pyne | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Roland Perrin | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Paul Ralph Cohen | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
CHRISTINE CASEY | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
JEAN CHURCH | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Janice Fay Coleman | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
KENNETH LITTLEJOHNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.90k | £440 | £3.96k | £2.06k | £800 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74k | £3.28k | £2.93k | £3.52k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1ST MAY 1973 as amended on 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE AND OPERATE TRANSPORT FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE RESIDENTS IN THE DISTRICTS OF WEST WITTERING, EAST WITTERING, BRACKLESHAM BAY,EARNLEY, ALMODINGTON, ITCHENON AND BIRDHAM, WHO MAY BE ELDERLY, OR INFIRM OR WHO, IRRESPECTIVE OF AGE, MAY BE TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY HANDICAPPED OR DIABLED. B) TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES EITHER SUPPLEMENTARY OR COMPLEMENTARY TO THE ABOVE AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DECIDED UPON BY THE COMMITTEE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dormer Cottage
Old Broyle Road
West Broyle
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 3PR
- Phone:
- 01243780334
- Email:
- trevorejames@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window